Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |