Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |