Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Moses added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Representative Melotik added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |