House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Representatives Murphy and Brandtjen added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Senator Tomczyk added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |