Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Senator Testin added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | Representative Callahan added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |