Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 10/25/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Introduced |