Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Published 2-20-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 2-19-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 94
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 2-13-2024 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 63, Noes 33
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 18, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 18, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Refused to refer to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 10, Noes 22
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|