House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 by committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 8-4-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Utilities and Technology, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Utilities and Technology, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bradley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bradley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|