Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB49 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: June 1, 2023 	Contact: Brian Larson, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 49 
Senate Substitute  
Amendment 1 
2023 SENATE BILL 49 
2023 Senate Bill 49 prohibits a political subdivision from placing any restriction, either directly or in 
effect, on the connection or reconnection of a utility service based on the type or source of energy to be 
provided. The bill also prohibits a political subdivision from discriminating against a public utility or a 
liquefied petroleum (LP) gas retailer, based in whole or in part on the nature or source of the utility 
service to be provided for a consumer.  
For purposes of the bill, a “political subdivision” includes a city, village, town, or county. The term 
“utility service” is defined to mean service—including electric, manufactured gas, LP gas, natural gas, 
hydrogen, fuel oil, a renewable source, or any other source—supplied by a public utility that is capable 
of providing and authorized to provide the service for the property of an individual or entity. Also, a 
“utility service” may include service to supply LP gas by a retailer, as specified in the bill. 
The bill also clarifies that these provisions do not affect the authority of a political subdivision to 
manage or operate a public utility, including regulation of gaseous fuels, under state law; nor do they 
affect the authority of a political subdivision to take steps designed to reduce greenhouse gas emissions 
from its facilities and operations, including purchasing renewable energy.  
SENATE SUBSTITUTE AMENDMENT 1 
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 includes the provisions in the bill, and it incorporates two additional 
changes into the legislation. First, under the substitute amendment, the provisions described above 
apply to state agencies and political subdivisions (instead of only political subdivisions, as under the 
bill). Second, the definition of “utility service” and the prohibition against discrimination are expanded 
to include service supplied by an electric cooperative. 
BILL HISTORY 
Senator Bradley introduced 2023 Senate Bill 49 on February 14, 2023. Senator Bradley offered Senate 
Substitute Amendment 1 to the bill on May 15, 2023. The Senate Committee on Utilities and 
Technology held a public hearing on May 16, 2023. The committee took action on May 25, 2023, 
recommending adoption of the substitute amendment on a vote of Ayes, 3; Noes, 2; and passage of the 
bill, as amended, on a vote of Ayes, 3; Noes, 2. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
BL:ksm