Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Introduced |