House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-15-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Received from Senate passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Rules suspended and taken up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Representative Maxey added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|