Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Failed to pass partial veto notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Published 3-30-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor with partial veto on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 250
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 27, Noes 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senator Wimberger added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Representative Tranel added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senator Tomczyk added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Armstrong added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|