Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Representative Joers withdrawn as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Representative Moore Omokunde withdrawn as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Representative Andraca withdrawn as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representatives Jacobson and Ratcliff withdrawn as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:03 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Passed, Ayes 17, Noes 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Motion for reconsideration of the vote by which Senate Bill 52 was passed offered by Senator Feyen, Ayes 19, Noes 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Refused passage, Ayes 16, Noes 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted, Ayes 19, Noes 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 placed after Senate Substitute Amendment 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Hesselbein
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senators Hesselbein and Spreitzer withdrawn as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|