Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Representative Zimmerman added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Introduced |