Senate | 05/16/2024 | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/03/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Introduced |