Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 10/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced |