Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Introduced |