Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Senator Larson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Refused to withdraw from committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 10, Noes 21 | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Senator Agard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Introduced |