Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced |