House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 10 | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Introduced |