Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced |