Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Senator L. Johnson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Introduced |