LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB57
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB57
Action History
Senate
04/15/2024
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Senate
04/04/2023
Fiscal estimate received
Senate
03/28/2023
Public hearing held
Senate
03/10/2023
Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
Senate
02/14/2023
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
Senate
02/14/2023
Introduced