Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |