Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |