Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Senator Taylor added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |