Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard | ||
Senate | 12/18/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |