Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Published 3-15-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 115
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Representative Bodden added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|