Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Laid on table | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Representatives Subeck and Shelton added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Representatives Steffen and Billings added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced |