Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Wimberger | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wimberger | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |