Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Representative Rodriguez added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Representative Novak added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Introduced |