House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 adopted | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |