Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 146
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2024 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 27, Noes 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 97, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Katsma
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 11:24 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|