Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB616 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 12, 2024 	Contact: Brian Larson, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 616 Senate Amendment 1 
2023 SENATE BILL 616 
2023 Senate Bill 616 (SB 616) makes various changes to the statutes administered by the Department of 
Revenue (DOR). This includes provisions creating a sales tax exemption for road-building equipment; 
increasing the income tax withholding threshold for nonresidents; modifying certification requirements 
for a qualified opportunity fund; modifying prohibitions on certain lottery games; and extending the 
capital gains exclusion to family members who inherit certain farms organized as an entity.  
SENATE AMENDMENT 1 
In addition to the changes described above, Senate Amendment 1 (SA 1) modifies provisions created in 
2023 Wisconsin Act 19 relating to a sales tax exemption for commercial loans. SA 1 clarifies that such 
commercial loans must be related to a business or agricultural purpose located in this state, and the 
exemption may first apply to tax years beginning in 2023. 
SA 1 also modifies provisions created in 2023 Wisconsin Act 73 relating to an electronic vaping device 
registry maintained by DOR and prohibiting the sale of electronic vaping devices that are not included 
on the registry. The amendment authorizes DOR to create the registry and begin enforcement no later 
than September 1, 2025, instead of March 1, 2025, as provided under Act 73.    
Additionally, SA 1 creates a nonstatutory provision increasing the full-time equivalent positions for 
DOR by 4.0 positions for cigarette, tobacco, and vapor enforcement, as of April 1, 2024, to be funded 
from the permanent endowment fund created from the state’s tobacco settlement agreement. The 
transfer from the permanent endowment fund to the Medical Assistance trust fund is reduced by the 
amount appropriated for cigarette, tobacco, and vapor enforcement in each fiscal year. 
BILL HISTORY 
On November 7, 2023, Senator Marklein introduced SB 616. On January 15, 2024, the Senate 
Committee on Universities and Revenue recommended passage of SB 616 on a vote of Ayes, 7; Noes, 1. 
On February 7, 2024, Senator Marklein offered SA 1, and the Joint Committee on Finance 
recommended adoption of SA 1, and passage of SB 616, as amended, on votes of Ayes, 15; Noes, 0. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
BL:ksm