Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |