Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representatives Palmeri, McGuire, Rettinger, Schutt, Cabrera and Subeck added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Representatives Nedweski and C. Anderson added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |