Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |