Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |