Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/31/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Representative Binsfeld added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced |