Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Representatives Plumer and Conley added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Representative VanderMeer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/10/2023 | Representative Oldenburg added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |