Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |