Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn | ||
Senate | 11/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Representatives Cabrera and Drake added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |