Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-15-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 185
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:23 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|