Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Published 8-5-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 8-4-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 28
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-28-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|