Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Published 4-5-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-4-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 267
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-1-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
LRB correction (Senate Amendment 3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:24 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 3 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Knodl
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Knodl
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Knodl
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|