Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Representative Schutt added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Representative Green added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Introduced |