Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Published 2-1-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 1-31-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 87
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 1-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Representatives Subeck and O'Connor added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Drake added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/17/2023
|
Representative Schutt added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|