Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Representative Tittl added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced |