Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/27/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Introduced |