Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Hutton | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hutton and Pfaff | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Introduced |